PA HB2178 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 30 (Fish) and 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in enforcement, further providing for powers and duties of waterways conservation officers and deputies and for powers and duties of enforcement officers.
Title
In enforcement, further providing for powers and duties of waterways conservation officers and deputies and for powers and duties of enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 202 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (190-6) |
2014-10-20 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-5) |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-28 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |