PA HB2177 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sexual offender treatment.
Title
In sentencing, further providing for sexual offender treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2177 PN 3083, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-01-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-21 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |