PA HB2176 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, further providing for the offense of unlawful contact with minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In minors, further providing for the offense of unlawful contact with minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2176 PN 3082, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2020-01-22SenateIn the Senate
2020-01-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2020-01-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-21HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-15HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-14HouseFirst consideration
2020-01-14HouseReported as committed
2020-01-06HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback