PA HB2175 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in depositions and witnesses, further providing for expert testimony in certain criminal proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In depositions and witnesses, further providing for expert testimony in certain criminal proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2175 PN 3131, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04436 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2020-01-22SenateIn the Senate
2020-01-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2020-01-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-21HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-15HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-14HouseFirst consideration
2020-01-14HouseReported as amended
2020-01-06HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2175
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2175&pn=3081
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2175&pn=3131
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/14/2020&RollCallId=1580
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/14/2020&RollCallId=1581
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1079
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/22/2020&RollCallId=1666

Bill Comments

feedback