PA HB2167 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property, further providing for property held by business associations.
Title
In disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property, further providing for property held by business associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Commerce: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-12 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-05-01 | House | Re-referred to FINANCE |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to FINANCE |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |