PA HB2162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 2050 in Montgomery County as the First Lieutenant Geoffrey Lawrence Ham Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 2050 in Montgomery County as the First Lieutenant Geoffrey Lawrence Ham Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2162 PN 3198, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2162 PN 3198, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2018-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-02 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-01 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |