PA HB2158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for career information and recruitment.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for career information and recruitment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2158 PN 3285, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2158 PN 3285, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-18 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-17 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |