PA HB2157 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 74 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 74 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for fireworks; and making a related repeal.
Title
Providing for fireworks; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2157 PN 3332, CONCUR (Y: 163 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2157 PN 3332, Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2157 PN 3277, 2021 A5272, BROWNE Amendment No. A-5272 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended A04571 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2157 PN 3198, FP (Y: 160 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2157 PN 3051, 2021 A4310 (Y: 168 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04122 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04127 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2157 PN 3332, CONCUR (Y: 163 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2157 PN 3332, Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2157 PN 3277, 2021 A5272, BROWNE Amendment No. A-5272 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended A04571 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2157 PN 3198, FP (Y: 160 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2157 PN 3051, 2021 A4310 (Y: 168 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04122 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04127 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 74 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (163-37) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-06-30 | House | In the House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-6) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-1) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2022-06-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (160-38) |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |