PA HB2156 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for Career and Technical Education Partnership Tax Credit Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for Career and Technical Education Partnership Tax Credit Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2156 PN 3472, FP (Y: 183 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A07003 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2156 PN 3277, 2017 A6859, TOBASH (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-05-02SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (183-7)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported as amended
2018-04-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-18HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-16HouseReported as committed
2018-04-06HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2156
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2156&pn=3277
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2156&pn=3394
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2156&pn=3472
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1420
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1141
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1511
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1509
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1237

Bill Comments

feedback