PA HB2156 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for Career and Technical Education Partnership Tax Credit Program.
Title
Providing for Career and Technical Education Partnership Tax Credit Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2156 PN 3472, FP (Y: 183 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A07003 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2156 PN 3277, 2017 A6859, TOBASH (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A07003 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2156 PN 3277, 2017 A6859, TOBASH (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-05-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (183-7) |
2018-05-01 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2018-04-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-04-17 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |