PA HB2152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the disposal of hospice or home health care patient medication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the disposal of hospice or home health care patient medication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2152 PN 3196, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-06-04SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2018-06-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2018-05-23HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-22HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-22HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-22HouseReported as committed
2018-03-26HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback