PA HB215 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for special plates for veterans and providing for special plates for recipients of Legion of Merit.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for special plates for veterans and providing for special plates for recipients of Legion of Merit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 1030, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 342, 2017 A204, LAWRENCE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00154 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00152 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00132 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 1030, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 342, 2017 A204, LAWRENCE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00154 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00152 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00132 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-03-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |