PA HB215 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person; and providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person; and providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 463, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 202, 2015 A79, GINGRICH (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 463, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 215 PN 202, 2015 A79, GINGRICH (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-02-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2015-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-02-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |