PA HB2148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 45 (Legal Notices) and 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in legal advertising, providing for redundant advertising on Internet by political subdivisions or municipal authorities; and, in open meetings, further providing for public notice.
Title
In legal advertising, providing for redundant advertising on Internet by political subdivisions or municipal authorities; and, in open meetings, further providing for public notice.
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. Karen Boback [R] | Rep. David Hickernell [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] | Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Sara Innamorato [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2148 PN 2586, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2148 PN 2537, 2021 A3284 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03204 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2148 PN 2586, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2148 PN 2537, 2021 A3284 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03204 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-1) |
2022-01-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-01-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |