PA HB2139 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 74 (Transportation) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in turnpike, further providing for definitions, for electronic toll collection and for annual hearing; in registration of vehicles, further providing for suspension of registration upon unpaid tolls; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for provisions relating to fare evasion.
Title
In turnpike, further providing for definitions, for electronic toll collection and for annual hearing; in registration of vehicles, further providing for suspension of registration upon unpaid tolls; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for provisions relating to fare evasion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04527 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2139 PN 2885, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03759 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04527 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2139 PN 2885, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03759 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2022-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-23 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-29 | House | First consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |