PA HB2137 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended A03153 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A03153 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A03153 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred to FINANCE |