PA HB2125 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in collective bargaining, further providing for definitions and providing for union leave.
Title
In collective bargaining, further providing for definitions and providing for union leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-02 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |