PA HB2120 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in medical assistance, further providing for nonemergency medical transportation services.
Title
In medical assistance, further providing for nonemergency medical transportation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04294 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04294 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |