PA HB2105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-02 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act abolishing numerous State authorities, boards, commissions, committees, councils and representatives; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolishing numerous State authorities, boards, commissions, committees, councils and representatives; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-25 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A09323 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07729 (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-19 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07689 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-25HouseReported as amended
2018-04-18HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2105
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2105&pn=3379
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2105&pn=4066
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1724
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1725
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1939
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1940

Bill Comments

feedback