PA HB2104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for decommissioning of alternative energy facilities.
Title
Providing for decommissioning of alternative energy facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2104 PN 3275, FP (Y: 121 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2104 PN 3044, 2021 A4776 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04043 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2104 PN 3275, FP (Y: 121 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2104 PN 3044, 2021 A4776 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04043 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (121-79) |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-11-23 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |