PA HB210 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in grounds and buildings, further providing for approval by department of plans of buildings and exceptions, providing for accountability and reducing costs in construction process, further providing for limitation on new applications for Department of Education approval of public school building projects; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for definitions, for approved reimbursable rental for leases hereafter approved and approved reimbursable sinking fund charges on indebtedness, for payments on account of leases hereafter approved and on account of sinking fund charges on indebtedness for school buildings hereafter constructed and for payments on account of building costs and providing for lump sum reimbursement for construction or reconstruction.
Title
In grounds and buildings, further providing for approval by department of plans of buildings and exceptions, providing for accountability and reducing costs in construction process, further providing for limitation on new applications for Department of Education approval of public school building projects; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for definitions, for approved reimbursable rental for leases hereafter approved and approved reimbursable sinking fund charges on indebtedness, for payments on account of leases hereafter approved and on account of sinking fund charges on indebtedness for school buildings hereafter constructed and for payments on account of building costs and providing for lump sum reimbursement for construction or reconstruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 693, FP (Y: 142 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A188, STURLA (Y: 83 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A205, SUSP RULES, STURLA (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A152, ACOSTA (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A57, SCHREIBER (Y: 85 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A55, MOT GERMANE, GROVE (Y: 83 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00055 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00055 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 693, FP (Y: 142 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A188, STURLA (Y: 83 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A205, SUSP RULES, STURLA (Y: 81 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A152, ACOSTA (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A57, SCHREIBER (Y: 85 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House Floor: HB 210 PN 200, 2015 A55, MOT GERMANE, GROVE (Y: 83 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00055 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00055 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2015-05-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (142-52) |
2015-05-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-02-23 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |