PA HB2091 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for building and housing regulations; repealing provisions relating to building and housing inspectors; and providing for Uniform Construction Code, property maintenance code and reserved powers.
Title
Further providing for building and housing regulations; repealing provisions relating to building and housing inspectors; and providing for Uniform Construction Code, property maintenance code and reserved powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-02 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |