PA HB2088 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 53827, on that portion of State Route 2003, also known as S. Porter Street, over the South Fork Tenmile Creek in Waynesburg, Greene County, as the Sheriff Brian A. Tennant Memorial Bridge; designating the interchange of State Route 43, also known as the Mon-Fayette Expressway, with U.S. Route 40, known as Exit 22, in Redstone Township, Fayette County, as the PFC Joseph Frank Duda Memorial Interchange; and designating the interchange of U.S. Route 40 with State Route 4035, also known as Market Street and Spring Street, in Brownsville, Fayette County, as the CPL Denny Ray Easter Memorial Interchange.
Title
Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 53827, on that portion of State Route 2003, also known as S. Porter Street, over the South Fork Tenmile Creek in Waynesburg, Greene County, as the Sheriff Brian A. Tennant Memorial Bridge; designating the interchange of State Route 43, also known as the Mon-Fayette Expressway, with U.S. Route 40, known as Exit 22, in Redstone Township, Fayette County, as the PFC Joseph Frank Duda Memorial Interchange; and designating the interchange of U.S. Route 40 with State Route 4035, also known as Market Street and Spring Street, in Brownsville, Fayette County, as the CPL Denny Ray Easter Memorial Interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2088 PN 2957, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2088 PN 2957, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-15 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |