PA HB2085 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 9A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 9A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019.
Title
Making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2085 PN 3148, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2085 PN 3148, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2085 PN 3148, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Act No. 9A |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-1) |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-17 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-11 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |