PA HB2084 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 8A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 8A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for fiscal year July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019.
Title
Making appropriations from the Philadelphia Taxicab and Limousine Regulatory Fund and the Philadelphia Taxicab Medallion Fund to the Philadelphia Parking Authority for fiscal year July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2084 PN 3147, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2084 PN 3147, FP (Y: 196 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2084 PN 3147, FP (Y: 196 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Act No. 8A |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-2) |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-17 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-11 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |