PA HB2073 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 5786, carrying State Route 3013, known as Dunnings Highway, over South Poplar Run, in Greenfield Township, Blair County, as the Bryan T. "Chipper" Chamberlain Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 5786, carrying State Route 3013, known as Dunnings Highway, over South Poplar Run, in Greenfield Township, Blair County, as the Bryan T. "Chipper" Chamberlain Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2073 PN 2395, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2073 PN 2395, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-04-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2022-04-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-03-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-03-30 | House | Second consideration |
2022-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |