PA HB2071 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 96 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 96 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, establishing the Pennsylvania Broadband Development Authority to provide broadband Internet access to unserved and underserved residents; and providing for powers and duties of the authority and for grant awards.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania Broadband Development Authority to provide broadband Internet access to unserved and underserved residents; and providing for powers and duties of the authority and for grant awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2071 PN 2518, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 2518, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Adopt Amendment A03202 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 2432, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 2392, 2021 A3054 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2071 PN 2518, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 2518, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Adopt Amendment A03202 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 2432, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 2392, 2021 A3054 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | House | Act No. 96 of 2021 |
2021-12-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-12-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-12-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-12-15 | House | Signed in House |
2021-12-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-12-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2021-12-15 | House | In the House |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-12-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-12-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-12-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |