PA HB2071 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-15 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-15 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for implementation of workplace violence policies and workplace violence prevention measures by employers and for civil action.
Title
Providing for implementation of workplace violence policies and workplace violence prevention measures by employers and for civil action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 4079, FP (Y: 164 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 3799, 2017 A8988, STEPHENS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08996 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08994 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08995 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08333 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 4079, FP (Y: 164 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 3799, 2017 A8988, STEPHENS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08996 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08994 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08995 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08333 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-10-09 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2018-10-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (164-18) |
2018-10-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |