PA HB2071 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for implementation of workplace violence policies and workplace violence prevention measures by employers and for civil action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for implementation of workplace violence policies and workplace violence prevention measures by employers and for civil action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 4079, FP (Y: 164 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2071 PN 3799, 2017 A8988, STEPHENS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08996 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08994 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08995 (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A08333 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-15SenateReported as committed
2018-10-09SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2018-10-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (164-18)
2018-10-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-09-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-21HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-21HouseReported as amended
2018-02-13HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2071
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2071&pn=3017
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2071&pn=3799
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2071&pn=4079
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1877
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1878
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1879
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1880
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1881
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1882
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1467
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1487
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1981
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1176

Bill Comments

feedback