PA HB2068 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of U.S. Route 11, also known as Main Street, from Segment 200, Offset 0000 to the intersection with Oak Street in Shickshinny Borough, Luzerne County, as the Honorable George C. Hasay Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of U.S. Route 11, also known as Main Street, from Segment 200, Offset 0000 to the intersection with Oak Street in Shickshinny Borough, Luzerne County, as the Honorable George C. Hasay Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2068 PN 2389, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2068 PN 2389, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-03-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-09 | House | Second consideration |
2022-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |