PA HB2060 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Passed on October 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms and providing for relinquishment of firearms and firearm licenses by convicted persons and for abandonment of firearms, weapons or ammunition; and, in protection from abuse, further providing for definitions, for commencement of proceedings, for hearings, for relief, for return of relinquished firearms, other weapons and ammunition and additional relief, for relinquishment for consignment sale, lawful transfer or safekeeping and for relinquishment to third party for safekeeping, imposing a penalty and providing for order to seal record from public view.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms and providing for relinquishment of firearms and firearm licenses by convicted persons and for abandonment of firearms, weapons or ammunition; and, in protection from abuse, further providing for definitions, for commencement of proceedings, for hearings, for relief, for return of relinquished firearms, other weapons and ammunition and additional relief, for relinquishment for consignment sale, lawful transfer or safekeeping and for relinquishment to third party for safekeeping, imposing a penalty and providing for order to seal record from public view.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2060 PN 3820, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2060 PN 3820, A9864, EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-9864 (Y: 9 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2060 PN 3820, FP (Y: 131 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2060 PN 3820, MOT RECOM JUDICIARY, KEEFER (Y: 42 N: 152 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2060 PN 3820, MOT POSTPONE, DUSH (Y: 13 N: 181 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A08933 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2060 PN 3754, 2017 A8014, METCALFE, MOT APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 167 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2060 PN 3754, 2017 A7865, PETRARCA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07622 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-12SenateAct No. 79
2018-10-12SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-12SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-12SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-09SenateSigned in House
2018-10-03SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-5)
2018-10-02SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-02SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-02SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-01SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-01SenateReported as committed
2018-09-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-09-26SenateIn the Senate
2018-09-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (131-62)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported as amended
2018-06-22HouseAmended on Second consideration, Re-committed to Appropriations and Amended in Appropriations
2018-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-19HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-19HouseReported as amended
2018-02-26HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2060
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2060&pn=3035
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2060&pn=3754
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2060&pn=3820
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1722
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1723
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1801
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1408
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1414
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1850
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1849
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1475
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1476
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1477
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1137
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/02/2018&RollCallId=1169
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=679
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=680

Bill Comments

feedback