PA HB2058 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Act No. 17 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Act No. 17 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes.
Title
In consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2058 PN 2365, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2058 PN 2365, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2058 PN 2365, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Act No. 17 of 2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2021-12-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-12-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-17 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to FINANCE |