PA HB2052 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in professional employees, providing for military parent student support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In professional employees, providing for military parent student support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2052 PN 3593, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2052 PN 3593, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07281 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-15SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-02SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-02SenateReported as committed
2018-06-15SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2018-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-06HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-04HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-04HouseReported as amended
2018-02-02HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2052
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2052&pn=2978
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2052&pn=3593
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1572
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1573
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1285
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2018&RollCallId=1618
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/02/2018&RollCallId=1158
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=742

Bill Comments

feedback