PA HB2044 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth; and, in county boards of elections, further providing for powers and duties of county boards.
Title
In the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth; and, in county boards of elections, further providing for powers and duties of county boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Nelson [R] | Rep. Clinton Owlett [R] | Rep. James Struzzi [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] |
Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Joe Hamm [R] |
Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Rep. Russ Diamond [R] | Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] |
Rep. Jack Rader [R] | Rep. Melinda Fee [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Daryl Metcalfe [R] |
Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R] | Rep. Rich Irvin [R] | Rep. Donald Cook [R] |
Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R] | Rep. Rob Mercuri [R] | Rep. James Gregory [R] | Rep. Abby Major [R] |
Rep. Jesse Topper [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Keith Greiner [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] | Rep. Eric Davanzo [R] | Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] | Rep. Bradley Roae [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, FP (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3095 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3088 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3087 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3074 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3062 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-11-08 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, FP (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3095 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3088 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3087 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3074 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2352, 2021 A3062 (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-11-08 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-12-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-90) |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-13 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-08 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-03 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |