PA HB204 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 204 PN 172, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-23SenateSecond consideration
2017-12-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-12-13SenateReported as committed
2017-03-24SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2017-03-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2017-03-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-20HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-07HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-07HouseReported as committed
2017-01-25HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=204
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0204&pn=0172
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=40
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=97
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=160
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=12/13/2017&RollCallId=600

Bill Comments

feedback