PA HB2039 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 71 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 71 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in crime victims, further providing for rights.
Title
In crime victims, further providing for rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 3323, CONCUR (Y: 141 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2039 PN 3323, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05095 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 2385, FP (Y: 139 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 2385, 2021 A2964 (Y: 83 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 2385, 2021 A2956 (Y: 82 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02844 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 3323, CONCUR (Y: 141 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2039 PN 3323, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05095 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 2385, FP (Y: 139 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 2385, 2021 A2964 (Y: 83 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2039 PN 2385, 2021 A2956 (Y: 82 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02844 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 71 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (141-59) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-06-29 | House | In the House |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-4) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-11-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (139-60) |
2021-11-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-10-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |