PA HB2039 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 20, 2015 (P.L.497, No.90), known as the Taxpayer-Funded Advertising Transparency Act, further providing for definitions and for advertising notification; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for advertising notification; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-14HouseFirst consideration
2020-01-14HouseReported as committed
2019-11-14HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback