PA HB203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors; and, in powers of appointment, further providing for exercise of powers of appointment.
Title
In dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors; and, in powers of appointment, further providing for exercise of powers of appointment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 203 PN 2519, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 203 PN 2519, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor: HB 203 PN 171, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 203 PN 2519, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 203 PN 2519, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor: HB 203 PN 171, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-30 | House | Act No. 41 |
2017-10-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-10-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-10-25 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-10-25 | House | Signed in House |
2017-10-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (190-0) |
2017-10-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-10-24 | House | In the House |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-10-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-04-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-22 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-21 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |