PA HB2026 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for grading of offense relating to police animals.
Title
Further providing for grading of offense relating to police animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act No. 75 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-03-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2014-03-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-17 | House | Second consideration |
2014-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |