PA HB2026 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in safe schools, further providing for Office for Safe Schools; in terms and courses of study, providing for dating violence education.
Title
In safe schools, further providing for Office for Safe Schools; in terms and courses of study, providing for dating violence education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - House - HB 2026 PN 3323, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 183 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - House - HB 2026 PN 3323, MOT RECOM TO EDUCATION, BROOKS (Y: 92 N: 97 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - House - HB 2026 PN 3190, 2009 A5914, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 96 N: 98 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-15 - House - HB 2026 PN 3323, MOT RECOM TO EDUCATION, BROOKS (Y: 92 N: 97 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - House - HB 2026 PN 3190, 2009 A5914, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 96 N: 98 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2010-03-16 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Final passage | |
2010-03-16 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Third consideration, rescinded | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on final passage calendar | |
2010-03-15 | Third consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-02-08 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-12-16 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-16 | Removed from table | |
2009-12-15 | Laid on the table | |
2009-12-15 | First consideration | |
2009-12-15 | Reported as committed | |
2009-10-06 | Referred to EDUCATION |