PA HB2025 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 59-8)
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Veto No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to conduct a public comment process on and submit to the General Assembly a measure or action intended to abate, control or limit carbon dioxide emissions by imposing a revenue-generating tax or fee on carbon dioxide emissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to conduct a public comment process on and submit to the General Assembly a measure or action intended to abate, control or limit carbon dioxide emissions by imposing a revenue-generating tax or fee on carbon dioxide emissions.

Sponsors

Rep. James Struzzi [R]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Pam Snyder [D]Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]
Rep. Cris Dush [R]Rep. Joseph Petrarca [D]Rep. Michael Turzai [R]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]
Rep. Kerry Benninghoff [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]Rep. Michael Reese [R]Rep. Daryl Metcalfe [R]
Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Michael Tobash [R]Rep. James Marshall [R]
Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. James Rigby [R]Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Barbara Gleim [R]
Rep. Keith Greiner [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]Rep. Jonathan Fritz [R]Rep. Neal Goodman [D]
Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Jason Ortitay [R]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. James Gregory [R]
Rep. Donald Cook [R]Rep. Marci Mustello [R]Rep. Joshua Kail [R]Rep. George Dunbar [R]
Rep. Clinton Owlett [R]Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Dawn Keefer [R]
Rep. Matthew Gabler [R]Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]Rep. Dan Moul [R]
Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Bradley Roae [R]Rep. Mike Jones [R]
Rep. Jerome Knowles [R]Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Justin Walsh [R]
Rep. Garth Everett [R]Rep. Robert James [R]Rep. Russ Diamond [R]Rep. Frank Burns [D]
Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R]
Rep. Timothy O'Neal [R]Rep. Sheryl Delozier [R]Rep. Stephanie Borowicz [R]Rep. Robert Brooks [R]
Rep. David Rowe [R]Rep. Martin Causer [R]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]
Rep. Eric Davanzo [R]Rep. Roni Green [D]Rep. Torren Ecker [R]

Roll Calls

2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, MOTION FOR THE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, FP (Y: 130 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6167, INNAMORATO (Y: 82 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6175, KRUEGER (Y: 60 N: 141 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6162, KRUEGER (Y: 74 N: 127 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6161, KRUEGER (Y: 73 N: 128 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6153, KRUEGER (Y: 75 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6147, KRUEGER (Y: 82 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6148, OTTEN (Y: 86 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2025 PN 3907, 2019 A6149, OTTEN (Y: 86 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A06028 (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24SenateVeto No. 12
2020-09-24SenateVetoed by the Governor
2020-09-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-09-16SenateSigned in House
2020-09-09SenateSigned in Senate
2020-09-09SenateThird consideration and final passage (33-17)
2020-09-09SenateMotion for the previous question (28-22)
2020-09-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-09-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-08SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-03SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-03SenateReported as committed
2020-07-13SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2020-07-08SenateIn the Senate
2020-07-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (130-71)
2020-07-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-07-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-07HouseSecond consideration
2020-07-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-09HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-06-09HouseFirst consideration
2020-06-09HouseReported as amended
2019-11-20HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2025
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2025&pn=2926
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2025&pn=3907
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=2173
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=2174
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1482
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1483
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1484
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1485
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1486
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1487
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1488
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/08/2020&RollCallId=2350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=9&theDate=09/03/2020&RollCallId=1077
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/08/2020&RollCallId=1100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=626
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=627

Bill Comments

feedback