PA HB2019 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 26, 1978 (P.L.1375, No.325), known as the Dam Safety and Encroachments Act, further providing for definitions and for projects affecting submerged lands of the Commonwealth.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for projects affecting submerged lands of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2019 PN 2332, FP (Y: 121 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2019 PN 2332, FP (Y: 121 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-01-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (121-80) |
2022-01-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-10 | House | Second consideration |
2022-01-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-10-27 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |