PA HB2018 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child custody, further providing for factors to consider when awarding custody.
Title
In child custody, further providing for factors to consider when awarding custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05626 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05626 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2024-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-09-30 | House | First consideration |
2024-09-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |