PA HB2004 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-21 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-21 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for qualifications and restrictions of Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board members.
Title
Further providing for qualifications and restrictions of Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-19 - House - HB 2004 PN 2747, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-21 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2011-12-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-12-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2011-12-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-12-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-15 | House | Second consideration |
2011-12-14 | House | Removed from table |
2011-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2011-11-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-10-04 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |