PA HB200 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1372, No.212), known as the Early Intervention Services System Act, further providing for title of the act, for definitions and for child identification, assessment and tracking system; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for title of the act, for definitions and for child identification, assessment and tracking system; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 200 PN 253, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-06-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2018-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |