PA HB200 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1372, No.212), known as the Early Intervention Services System Act, further providing for title of the act, for definitions and for child identification, assessment and tracking system; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for title of the act, for definitions and for child identification, assessment and tracking system; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 200 PN 253, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2018-05-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-23HouseReported as committed
2017-02-01HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback