PA HB1997 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in medical assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for in-patient behavioral health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In medical assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for in-patient behavioral health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1997 PN 3352, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A06526 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-30HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-18HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-16HouseReported as amended
2018-01-05HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1997
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1997&pn=2864
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1997&pn=3352
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1430
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=1431
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1501

Bill Comments

feedback