PA HB1997 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in medical assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for in-patient behavioral health services.
Title
In medical assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for in-patient behavioral health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1997 PN 3352, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A06526 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1997 PN 3352, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A06526 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2018-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-18 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to HEALTH |