PA HB1990 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-04 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-04 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to Associate Members of Old Mill Village Museum, Inc., certain lands situate in New Milford Township, Susquehanna County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to Associate Members of Old Mill Village Museum, Inc., certain lands situate in New Milford Township, Susquehanna County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1990 PN 3365, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1990 PN 3365, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1990 PN 3172, 2015 A7094, MAJOR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1990 PN 3365, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1990 PN 3172, 2015 A7094, MAJOR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-04 | Senate | Act No. 106 |
2016-10-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2016-05-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2016-05-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-05-03 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |