PA HB1987 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, providing for dispensing of fentanyl.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for dispensing of fentanyl.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1987 PN 3678, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1987 PN 3554, 2017 A7352, TOPPER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07188 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-22HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-22HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-22HouseReported as amended
2017-12-22HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1987
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1987&pn=2849
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1987&pn=3554
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1987&pn=3678
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=1529
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=1530
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1305
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1318
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=1665

Bill Comments

feedback